Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/17/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/07/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/13/2014