Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/26/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/27/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/27/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/28/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 03/05/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/06/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/10/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/15/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/25/2013