Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/28/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/28/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/28/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/14/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/10/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/26/2014