Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2013