Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/05/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/26/2013