Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/12/2013