Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/25/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/28/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/28/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/28/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/05/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/05/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/05/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/05/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/05/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/07/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/07/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/07/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/18/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/21/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 04/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/18/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/18/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/26/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/26/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/26/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/30/2013