Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/28/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/05/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/26/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/30/2013