Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/05/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/18/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/26/2013