Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/17/2013