Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/05/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/05/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/05/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/05/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/27/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/18/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2014