Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/26/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 08/01/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 08/02/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/04/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/04/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/10/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/06/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/27/2014