Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/17/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/10/2014