Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/25/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/11/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/25/2013