Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 02/15/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/26/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/27/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/27/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/27/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/28/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/28/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/28/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/05/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/05/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/06/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/06/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/06/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/07/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/07/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/07/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 03/11/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/11/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/11/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/11/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/11/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/12/2013