Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/11/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/25/2013