Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/14/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/15/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/26/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/26/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/26/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/26/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/13/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/17/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/27/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/09/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/05/2014