Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/27/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/13/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/15/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/15/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/18/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/26/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/30/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/26/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/26/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/30/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/09/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/28/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/27/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/05/2014