Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 05/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/16/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/16/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/21/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/21/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/10/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/02/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/07/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/10/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/07/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/07/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/10/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/10/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/10/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/10/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/14/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/14/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 01/15/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/15/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/15/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/27/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/27/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/27/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 01/27/2014