Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 01/27/2014