Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/15/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/27/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/25/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/17/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/14/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/17/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/17/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/26/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew