Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/26/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/27/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/13/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/25/2014