Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/26/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 02/27/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/27/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/04/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/06/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/15/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/27/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/10/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2014