Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/27/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/16/2013