Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/15/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/26/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/27/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/27/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/27/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/04/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/06/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/26/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/16/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/07/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 03/06/2014