Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/27/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/28/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/07/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 03/06/2014