Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/11/2013