Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/26/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/26/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 02/27/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/27/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/28/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/13/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/10/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/25/2014