Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 01/29/2014