Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/15/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/27/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/27/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/27/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/07/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/18/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 04/24/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/26/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/30/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/16/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/16/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/16/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/21/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/14/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/17/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/15/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 11/15/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/22/2013