Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/27/2014