Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/27/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/16/2013