Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/08/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/13/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 01/14/2014