Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/13/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/21/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/18/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 08/02/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/28/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/28/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/14/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2014