Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/14/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/14/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/14/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/14/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/14/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/15/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/15/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/15/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/15/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/18/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/18/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/18/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/18/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/22/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/04/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 09/11/2013