Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/15/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 10/15/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/16/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/23/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/23/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/21/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/05/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/09/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/10/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/11/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/11/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/11/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/25/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/25/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/24/2014