Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/25/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/25/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/25/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/28/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/09/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/05/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/05/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/05/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/10/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/10/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/13/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/01/2014