Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/08/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/08/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/08/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/08/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/12/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/13/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/25/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/26/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/27/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/27/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/28/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/28/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/13/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/13/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 03/13/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/15/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/19/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/10/2013