Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/15/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/19/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/19/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/16/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/16/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 08/01/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 10/08/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/21/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/24/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew