Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/28/2013