Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/20/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/20/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/11/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/15/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/17/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/17/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/08/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 10/28/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/29/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/09/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/13/2014