Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/04/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/23/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/29/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/29/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/16/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/27/2014