Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/13/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/13/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/25/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/25/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/05/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/05/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/05/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/18/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/18/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/19/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/10/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/25/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/25/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/06/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/06/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/12/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/27/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/31/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/11/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/26/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/02/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/11/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/10/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/21/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/04/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/04/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/14/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/25/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/04/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/28/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/01/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/07/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/09/2014