Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/27/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/12/2013