Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/19/2013