Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/06/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/08/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/05/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/06/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/13/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/13/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 10/22/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 11/20/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/20/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/20/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/03/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/04/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/11/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/25/2014