Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/25/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 04/17/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 04/18/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/18/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/18/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/23/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/23/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/26/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/26/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 05/07/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/07/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/07/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/14/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/14/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/22/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/22/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/04/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/04/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/09/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/18/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/23/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 07/23/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/23/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/23/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/25/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/10/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/17/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/14/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/07/2014