Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/04/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/04/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/25/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/25/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/25/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/16/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/02/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/28/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/27/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/02/2014