Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/05/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/04/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/04/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/04/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/04/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/04/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/04/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/04/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/04/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/21/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/23/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/23/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/23/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/23/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/25/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/25/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/25/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/16/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/23/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/11/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/23/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/23/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/02/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/04/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/16/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/22/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/13/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/10/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/10/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/28/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/12/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/24/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/27/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/02/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/04/2014