Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/14/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/26/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/26/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/13/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/13/2013